judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE VS. UNITED TITLE OF NEVADA

Case Information: 38207
Short Caption:WHITE VS. UNITED TITLE OF NEVADACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A359997Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/01/2001 / Kaufman, JerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greg Beber, Esq.--check no. 436.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12395
08/01/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/06/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-13224
08/29/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-14647
08/29/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-14648
08/29/2001Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 01-14649
09/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appeal, filed on August 6, 2001, is denied as moot.] SNP/CLK 01-15729
09/18/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.