judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODMAN VS. CALAHAN

Case Information: 34843
Short Caption:RODMAN VS. CALAHANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A368298Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/24/1999 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 047689.
09/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08847
09/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-12039
12/02/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 01/11/00 order: Settlement Agreement stricken and removed. 99-12040
12/02/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-12041
01/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 12, 1999, this court received a letter from the settlement conference judge requesting that the settlement agreement filed on December 2, 1999, be removed from the court's file. Because the settlement agreement filed with this court is a confidential document under NRAP 16(h) and should not have been submitted to this court, the clerk of this court shall herewith strike from the record the settlement agreement filed on December 2, 1999. 01/11/00 Order: settlement agreement stricken and removed from file. 00-00441
01/11/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter returning Settlement Agreement to Israel Kunin, Settlement Judge. Pursuant to the Order filed 01/11/00. 00-00443
02/01/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 00-01613
02/01/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.