Case Heading (S-08-0053) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0053 | Case Docketed On: | 03/06/2008 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18) | ||
Short Title: | RICHARD COFFINBERRY v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF HOT SPRINGS, WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | RICHARD COFFINBERRY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF THE COUNTY OF HOT SPRINGS, WYOMING, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Richard A. Coffinberry | Pro Se |
Appellee | The Board of County Commissioners of Hot Springs County, Wyoming | Jerry D. Williams |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Contracts, Governmental Claims, Other |
Opinion Number: | 2008 WY 109 |
Citation: | 192 P.3d 978 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/06/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/06/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/06/2008 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
03/06/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/31/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/09/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
05/13/2008 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
05/27/2008 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
05/28/2008 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
05/28/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/04/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/04/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
09/18/2008 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
10/06/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
10/06/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
10/06/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
10/06/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
10/10/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |