judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. C. REEVES v. HOUSTON OIL COMPANY OF TEXAS

Case: A-2724
A-2724
05/26/1950
Application for Writ of Error
J. C. REEVES
HOUSTON OIL COMPANY OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/18/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/12/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/20/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/26/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/18/1950Brief in Support of Petition
07/12/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/03/1950Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
06/27/1950Additional Copies received
06/20/1950Response to Petition
05/26/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/26/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Houston Oil Company of TexasRespondent
J. C. ReevesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information