judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KAREN FEENEY V. JOSEPH M. MAGNOLIA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1220
Short Caption:KAREN FEENEY V. JOSEPH M. MAGNOLIA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB1931-06Filed Date:09/27/2010

Opening Event Date:09/27/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/15/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKaren Feeney N
Geoffrey M. BohnYN
Robert A. BatteyNN
AppelleeJoseph M. Magnolia N
John M. RemyNY
Andrew S. Cabana YN
AppelleeJohn D. Magnolia N
John M. RemyNY
Andrew S. Cabana YN
AppelleeMagnolia Plumbing Inc.N
John M. RemyNY
Andrew S. Cabana YN
AppelleeJoseph M. Magnolia IncN
John M. RemyNY
Andrew S. Cabana YN
AppelleeRichardo A. Tormo N
Andrew S. Cabana YN
John M. RemyNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 27, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
11/12/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
11/24/2010RECORD INDEX
11/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/30/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/10/2011APPENDIX- aplt
02/09/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/04/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/12/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/15/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/15/2011SUBMITTED (WASHINGTON, BLACKBURNE-RIGSBY, NEBEKER)
06/30/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
07/22/2011FiledMandate