Case Information: 38203 | |||
Short Caption: | BRIGGS, SR. (TERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39534 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C53751 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Maupin for Justice Leavitt | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/14/2001 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/20/2001 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
07/20/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/20/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-12383 | |
08/13/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 01-13678 | |
12/14/2001 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 01-21078 | |
12/14/2001 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/15/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-WM/CY/DA | 02-06670 | |
05/10/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-06846 | |
05/10/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 15, 2002. | 02-06846 |