judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRYAN ALLAN TEMEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0071)
Case Number:S-08-0071Case Docketed On:03/31/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BRYAN ALLAN TEMEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRYAN ALLAN TEMEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBryan Allan TemenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 25
Citation:201 P.3d 1139

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/31/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/19/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2008Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
07/01/2008Event - Hardcopy received ErrataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/02/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/03/2008Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/22/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/31/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, jury instructions & verdict; Volume III, transcripts; Volumes IV-V, exhibits; Volume VI, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/24/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/12/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/12/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/16/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/13/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal