judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

EDWARD H. BONEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1272
Short Caption:EDWARD H. BONEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL494-03Filed Date:10/08/2010

Opening Event Date:10/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEdward H. BoneyYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Shane N. WallerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 8, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
07/20/2011FiledRecord Index
07/20/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/20/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/08/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit BA & and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/in 20 days.
09/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix to Brief (In letter format -- Served by: DCCA on 10/3/11). Appendix (Appellant)Granted
11/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the limited appendix for 20 days
12/20/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the limit appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
12/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/21/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/25/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
01/26/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/15/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
05/15/2012FiledAffirmed
06/07/2012FiledMandate