judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAREN McGARVEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0070)
Case Number:S-08-0070Case Docketed On:03/28/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:KAREN McGARVEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KAREN McGARVEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKaren McGARVEYDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig
Eric Thompson
Jill Cottle Garrett

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 8
Citation:200 P.3d 785

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/28/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/15/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/27/2008Brief - Appellee - students listed will be added as counsel when consent and approvals filed. Jenny Craig title as interim director of PAP.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2008Event - Hardcopy received and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Eric Thompson and Jill Cottle Garrett to appear on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jill Cottle Garrett, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/31/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan for appellant and D. Michael Pauling, Jill Cottle Garrett, argument by Ms. Garrett for appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/17/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/20/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/19/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal