judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WASHINGTON (BARUCH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38202
Short Caption:WASHINGTON (BARUCH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36496 , 36626 , 39754
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162774Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/07/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12379
08/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38096/38173/38180/38202/38203. 01-13677
12/07/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. 01-20554
12/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/24/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-07245
05/21/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-07332
05/21/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/17/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2002. 02-07332