judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANFORD (CHARLES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34847
Short Caption:SANFORD (CHARLES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C148333Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08861
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person. It appears that appellant was represented by Althea Gilkey during the lower ocurt proceedings. Attorney Althea Gilkey shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 99-09408
10/22/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-10345
12/07/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12253
01/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00084
01/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2000. 00-00084