Case Heading (S-08-0064) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0064 | Case Docketed On: | 03/25/2008 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Crook County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | BRYAN PAUL SHARP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | BRYAN PAUL SHARP, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Bryan Paul Sharp | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Graham Macdonald Smith |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Probation, Criminal Law -Sentencing -Restitution and Other Assessments |
Opinion Number: | 2008 WY 142 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/25/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/25/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/25/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
05/12/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/12/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/15/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (amended) | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
05/23/2008 | Correspondence - Incoming - received "grievance" from appellant regarding the brief of appellant filed on his behalf. | Correspondence | Incoming | Final | |
05/23/2008 | Correspondence - Outgoing - sent response to Mr. Sharp's "grievance." | Correspondence | Outgoing | Final | |
06/23/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
06/24/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received and copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/27/2008 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
07/10/2008 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
07/10/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - reply brief of appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/11/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/14/2008 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
07/17/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
07/17/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/17/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
12/05/2008 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Hill writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
12/09/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion signed for by Wyoming State Penitentiary. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
12/23/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
12/23/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
12/23/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
12/23/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
12/29/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/24/08 by S. Crawford. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final | |
12/29/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate signed for 12/24/08 by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |