judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TROY R. THOMAS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1231
Short Caption:TROY R. THOMAS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-13860-09Filed Date:09/30/2010

Opening Event Date:09/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:10/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTroy R. Thomas YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Peter H. Meyers, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Peter H. Meyers, Esquire
10/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10 pgs/Rogers) 10/5/09 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (7 pgs/Hunt) 11/20/09 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (18 pgs/tape) 1/26/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (16 pgs/Davis) 5/17/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/tape) 6/2/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (237 pgs/Davis) 6/3/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (37 pgs/Walker) 6/4/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (191 pgs/Walker) 6/7/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (192-391 pgs/Walker) 6/8/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (392-590 pgs/Walker) 6/9/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (591-746 pgs/Walker) 6/10/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (747-850 pgs/Walker) 6/11/10 proc.
02/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (25 pgs/Hunt) 6/14/10 proc. w/cd
02/25/2011RECORD INDEX
02/25/2011RECORD COPIES
02/25/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (order-Judge Dixon filed 6/2/10 ****SEALED****
03/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (16 pgs/Gilliam) 5/25/10 proc. w/cd
04/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (10 pgs/McCarn) 4/19/10 proc.
04/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/27/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 8, 2011. (JAC)
07/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/21/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
07/21/2011FiledMotion for Leave to File Pro Se Brief (brief attached) (Appellant)Denied
07/27/2011FiledTMC-MOTION TO FILE PRO SE BRIEF- OPPO-MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING
07/28/2011FiledOpposition (Appellee)
08/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
09/14/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PRO SE BRIEF and GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING
10/20/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/20/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/12/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
04/18/2012FiledReply Brief (pro se) (Appellant)
04/18/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's second motion to file supplemental brief.
04/27/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellee)Granted
05/04/2012FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to file supplemental brief.
05/04/2012FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellee)
05/31/2012FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Thompson, Long
06/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Long, Associate Judge, Superior Court of the District of Columbia.)
06/20/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
07/17/2012FiledOrder Denying Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc.
07/26/2012FiledMandate
08/08/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
10/19/2012FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
11/15/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
04/26/2016FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
04/26/2016FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)Denied
04/27/2016FiledTMC (Motion to Recall Mandate & Motion for Appointment of Counsel)
09/27/2016FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion for appointment of counsel; FO motion to recall mandate is denied