judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WASHOE COUNTY SHERIFF VS. GRANTHAM

Case Information: 34616
Short Caption:WASHOE COUNTY SHERIFF VS. GRANTHAMCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990427Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/20/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07148
08/06/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption.
08/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This is an appeal from an order of the district court granting a pretrial petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court the original and complete trial court record as the record on appeal. Upon the filing of the record, this appeal shall stand submitted for decision without futher briefing or oral argument unless this court otherwise orders. 99-07606
08/20/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 99-07813
08/20/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11519
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 99-12633
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/05/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2000. 99-12633