judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AXEL-FELIX KLEIBOEMER V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 79-TX-0123
Short Caption:AXEL-FELIX KLEIBOEMER V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Tax - Tax
Lead:79-TX-0123Consolidated: 79-TX-0547 , 81-TX-1232
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:2379Filed Date:01/19/1979

Opening Event Date:01/19/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/30/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/27/1982
Argued/Submitted:11/03/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KLEIBOEMER, AXEL-FELIX DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
01/19/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/30/1981FiledRecord Completed
08/27/1982FiledBriefing Completed
11/03/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/22/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition