judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KATHERINE J. ALLEN FORBIS v. TIMOTHY DALE FORBIS

Case Heading (S-08-0063)
Case Number:S-08-0063Case Docketed On:03/25/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:KATHERINE J. ALLEN FORBIS v. TIMOTHY DALE FORBIS
Full Title:KATHERINE J. ALLEN FORBIS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TIMOTHY DALE FORBIS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKatherine J. Allen ForbisMitchell E. Osborn
AppelleeTimothy Dale ForbisMatthew H. Romsa
John Matthew Kuker
James Michael Peterson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2009 WY 41
Citation:203 P.3d 421

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/25/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/05/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/06/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/27/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/27/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/02/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/04/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from appellee's office. They have not received brief. Certificate of service contains wrong address - she'll contact Mr. Osborn.EventPhone CallFinal
07/17/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Timothy Dale ForbisEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/18/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/05/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, original papers, volume II, transcript; volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/06/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/06/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal