judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARY PUCKREIN, ET AL V. DC ZONING COMM.

Case Information: 10-AA-1226
Short Caption:GARY PUCKREIN, ET AL V. DC ZONING COMM.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Zoning Commission
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ZC03-09Filed Date:10/07/2010

Opening Event Date:10/07/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentSkyland Holdings, LLCN
Paul A. TummondsNY
Leonard H. Freiman NN
PetitionerCynthia Brock-Smith N
Martin P. SullivanNY
PetitionerGary Puckrein N
Martin P. SullivanNY
PetitionerRonald Cole N
Martin P. SullivanNY
RespondentD.C. Zoning CommissionN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/07/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/07/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
11/01/2010NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE Skyland Holdings, LLC on behalf of Resp.
12/03/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
12/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/08/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's and intervenor's briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
01/21/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 8, 2010, directing petitioner to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
02/02/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED of Paul A. Tummonds,Jr
02/02/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/10/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/10/2011DISMISSED
03/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED