judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUBLETTE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER NINE, STATE OF WYOMING and SUBLETTE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING and CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING; FREMONT COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 24, STATE OF WYOMING; and LINCOLN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING v. JIM McBRIDE, STATE SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION, in his official capacity

Case Heading (S-08-0073)
Case Number:S-08-0073Case Docketed On:03/31/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:SUBLETTE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER NINE, STATE OF WYOMING and SUBLETTE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING and CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING; FREMONT COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 24, STATE OF WYOMING; and LINCOLN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING v. JIM McBRIDE, STATE SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION, in his official capacity
Full Title:SUBLETTE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER NINE, STATE OF WYOMING and SUBLETTE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellants (Plaintiffs), and CAMPBELL COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING; FREMONT COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NO. 24, STATE OF WYOMING; and LINCOLN COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellants (Intervening Plaintiffs), v. JIM McBRIDE, STATE SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC INSTRUCTION, in his official capacity, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSublette County School District Number NineTracy J. Copenhaver
AppellantSublette County School District Number OneMark W. Gifford
AppellantCampbell County School DistrictFord T. Bussart
AppellantFremont County School District No. 24Joel M. Vincent
AppellantLincoln County School District Number OneTracy J. Copenhaver
AppelleeJames M. McBrideBruce A. Salzburg
Michael R. O'Donnell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Wyoming, Other, Schools, Statutes
Opinion Number:2008 WY 152
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/31/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/31/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
03/31/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/15/2008Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
04/15/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice HillNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/02/2008Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
06/02/2008Record - Other - stipulated joint appendixRecordOtherFinal
07/17/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/17/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee with appendix.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Errata (part of appendix to brief of appellee that was inadvertently omitted from electronic filing - is included on hard copy)Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
08/04/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/05/2008Service - Certificate of service (Amended)ServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received reply brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received amended certificate of serviceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark Gifford for Sublette Co. School District No. One.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael R. O'Donnell for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/26/2008Order - Assignment of judge Jeffrey A. Donnell to act in this matter (Justice Hill recused)OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
09/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ford Bussart for Campbell Co. School District.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tracy J. Copenhaver for Sublette Co. School District #9 and Lincoln Co. School District #9; and Joel Vincent for Fremont Co. School District No. 24.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Kite and Burke, and Judge Donnell (Fort T. Bussart, Tracy J. Copenhaver, Mark W. Gifford and Joel M Vincent, arguments by Messrs. Bussart, Copenhaver and Gifford for appellants; Michael R. O'Donnell, Special Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/19/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering the first certified question "Yes." District Judge Donnell writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/06/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal