judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLYNN P. NEAL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1238
Short Caption:GLYNN P. NEAL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD11739-10Filed Date:10/04/2010

Opening Event Date:10/04/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/26/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/21/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGlynn P. Neal Y
James W. KleinNY
Stefanie SchneiderNY
Leila Thamer NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John P. TavanaNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/04/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/26/2010RECORD INDEX
10/26/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (15pgs/Tape) 9/27/10 proc. (Morning)
10/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (39pgs/Tape) 9/27/10 proc. (Afternoon)
10/26/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (35pgs/Tape) 9/28/10 proc. w/CD
10/26/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/17/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
11/19/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
12/23/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until 90 days (no oppo)
01/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 29, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/05/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 4, 2011, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before March 29, 2011, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order, submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the documents out of time. The motion shall set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
04/22/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (Neal) no oppo
07/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 90 days (Appellant)Granted
10/07/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 17, 2011
11/08/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/08/2011FiledAppendix (attached to Appellant's Brief) (Appellant)
12/07/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
12/08/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO
12/13/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance. (Appellant)
02/08/2012FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/08/2012FiledAffirmed
03/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing or rhearing en banc until April 1, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
03/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to April 1, 2012.
03/21/2014FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/21/2014FiledMandate