judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT (ROGER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38206
Short Caption:SCOTT (ROGER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35597 , 37130 , 38240 , 40305 , 40439
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C132042Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12391
08/24/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn3-[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-14360
09/18/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14395
09/18/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 20, 2001. 01-14395