judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEMETRIC PEARSON V. EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1239
Short Caption:DEMETRIC PEARSON V. EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4598-10Filed Date:09/27/2010

Opening Event Date:09/27/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/23/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDemetric Pearson YPro SeN
AppelleeEdgewood Management Inc.N
Robert P. LynchNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/04/2010RECEIVED - courtsey copy of a Praceipe filed in the Superior Court requesting the Court to dismiss the NOA filed on 9/27/10
10/07/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief
10/19/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED as the case remains pending in the Superior Court. See DC Code 11-721 (2001);... (BY: ETW)
10/20/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 10/19/10
11/01/2010 On consideration of the October 19, 2010, order which directed appellant to show cause...appellant's response thereto with the attached Praecipe for voluntary dismissal filed in Superior Court, it is ORDERED that this appeal is HEREBY DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 13 (a). (BY: ETW) lw
11/01/2010DISMISSED
11/23/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived