judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS WITOWSKI v. GAYLE (WITOWSKI) ROOSEVELT

Case Heading (S-08-0074)
Case Number:S-08-0074Case Docketed On:04/01/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:THOMAS WITOWSKI v. GAYLE (WITOWSKI) ROOSEVELT
Full Title:THOMAS WITOWSKI, Appellant (Defendant), v. GAYLE (WITOWSKI) ROOSEVELT, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas WitowskiRobert E. Schroth Sr.
AppelleeGayle RooseveltDavid G. Lewis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Support, Civil Procedure, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 5
Citation:199 P.3d 1072 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/01/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/01/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/01/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/07/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/07/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/18/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/05/2008Motion - Accept late filingMotionAccept late filingFinal
08/06/2008Order - Other. Order accepting appellee's brief one day late.OrderOtherFinal
08/06/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to accept appellee's brief one day late.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/25/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/05/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/22/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/17/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/12/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal