judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUEGAMER (ALAN LEE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32929
Short Caption:RUEGAMER (ALAN LEE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33069 , 38412
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123975Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/20/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/12/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to cousel for appellant.)
09/17/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporters: Alice Eastgate and Debra Winn.
09/17/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporters: Cathy Nelson, Suzy Nichols, Debra Winn, Robert Minton, and Arlene Blazi.
09/17/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
09/23/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate.
09/30/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Calendar Call--10/4/95; Calendar Call--4/17/96; Request for Trial Date--4/22/96; Motions--7/29/96; Status Check--8/12/96; Motion to Withdraw--12/2/96; Motion to Continue--12/18/96. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate and Debra Winn.
10/26/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified copy of Reporter's Transcript dated: 7/23/97; 8/11/97; 8/13/97; 8/18/97; 9/23/97; 10/22/97; 11/12/97; 1/16/98; 1/26/98; 2/23/98; 3/19/98; 3/26/98; 4/2/98; (6/8/98; 6/9/98; 6/10/98; 6/11/98; 6/12/98; 6/15/98; 6/16/98; 6/17/98; 6/19/98;) 6/9/98; 6/10/98; 6/11/98; 6/12/98; 6/15/98; 6/16/98; 6/17/98; 8/3/98. Court Reporters: Cathy Nelson; Debra Winn; Arlene Blazi and Robert Mintun.
12/28/1998MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. That Appellant shall have to and including February 2, 1999, to file the Opening Brief.
02/04/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File 51 page Opening Brief (mailed on: 02/02/99).
02/04/1999BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief (mailed on: 02/02/99).
02/04/1999AppendixReceived Appendix. Joint Appendix of Record, Vols. I through V.
02/19/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. That Respondent may have to and including April 5, 1999, within which to file the answering brief.
02/23/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Order granting Motion. The unopposed motion filed February 4, 1999, is granted. The clerk shall forthwith file the fifty-one page opening brief and the joint appendix, provisionally submitted with the motion. Pursuant to the stipulation and order filed February 19, 1999, respondent shall serve and file the answering brief by April 5, 1999. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a) (1).
02/23/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
02/23/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix of Record, Vols. I through V. Mailed on: 2/2/99.
04/06/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. That Respondent may file the answering brief in excess of 30 pages. To-wit: 38 pages.
04/06/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (mailed: express mail).
05/10/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 5/6/99).
09/02/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Voluntary recusal of Justice Becker from participation in this matter (sat in district court proceedings). per D. Lindsey
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 10, 2000 at the hour of 9:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, RR)
12/09/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument.
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We vacate the oral argument presently scheduled in this matter for January 10, 2000, at 9:00 a.m.. The clerk shall reschedule this matter for oral argument on January 20, 2000, at 11:00 a.m., in Las Vegas before the Southern Nevada Panel. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (Called all counsel and read the order).
01/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/12/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/20/2000Other Other. Oral Argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-RR/WM/MS
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-RR/MS/NB 00-03276
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04936
03/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/18/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2000. 00-04936