judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSEPH MICHAEL SHAW v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0055)
Case Number:S-08-0055Case Docketed On:03/07/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JOSEPH MICHAEL SHAW v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOSEPH MICHAEL SHAW, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoseph Michael ShawDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 18
Citation:201 P.3d 1108

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/07/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/24/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/25/2008Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
04/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - errata sheetEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/30/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes. Volumes I & II. Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Report; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for Appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/12/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/12/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/23/2009Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
02/23/2009Brief - Petitioner - brief in support of petition for rehearing.BriefPetitionerFinal
02/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for rehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief in support of petition for rehearing.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/03/2009Order - Petition for rehearing - denyingOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
03/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/03/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/03/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/05/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/4/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal