judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATALE N. STRACUZZI V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICS

Case Information: 10-AA-1221
Short Caption:NATALE N. STRACUZZI V. DC BD OF ELECTIONS & ETHICSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Bd Elections & Ethics (BEE)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/04/2010

Opening Event Date:10/04/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerNatale N. Stracuzzi YPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Board of Elections & EthicsN
Terri D. StroudNY
Kenneth J. McGhieNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/04/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW-FILED PER 1012/10 ORDER LW
10/04/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
10/04/2010RECEIVED Exhibits 1-3.
10/05/2010TMC - (LODGED) PFR - motion to proceed IFP - respondent's motion to dismiss
10/05/2010RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
10/12/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the LODGED PFR. It is *****MORE*****
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED. Petition does not contain a concise statement of his claims or identify with specification facts showing that the primary was seriously flawed entitling him to relief. See Jackson v. DC BD of Elections & Ethics, 770 A.2d 79 (DC 2001)... (RZGLNB) (rm)
10/12/2010DISMISSED
10/12/2010RECEIVED- petitioner's to respondent's motion to dismiss
11/04/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived