judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRACE BUSCH v. HORTON AUTOMATICS, INC., a Division of OVERHEAD DOOR CORPORATION

Case Heading (S-08-0024)
Case Number:S-08-0024Case Docketed On:02/07/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:GRACE BUSCH v. HORTON AUTOMATICS, INC., a Division of OVERHEAD DOOR CORPORATION
Full Title:GRACE BUSCH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. HORTON AUTOMATICS, INC., a Division of OVERHEAD DOOR CORPORATION, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGrace BuschM. Jalie Meinecke
AppelleeHorton Automatics, Inc., a Division of Overhead Door CorporationJeffrey C. Brinkerhoff
Kelley A. Anderson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 140
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/07/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court from District Court ClerkNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/07/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/24/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/28/2008Brief - Appellee and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/15/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/21/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/25/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remandingOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/09/2008Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
12/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received Appellee's Petition for Rehearing and Brief in SupportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2008Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/07/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/5/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal