judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE M. HENDERSON V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1192
Short Caption:ANDRE M. HENDERSON V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PWVK166014-09Filed Date:05/26/2010

Opening Event Date:05/26/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/22/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAndre M. Henderson NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/26/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECEIVED ONLY)
09/24/2010RECEIVED - Petitioner's Motion for Stay
09/30/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, either file a fully completed motion to proceed IFP and financial information statement, OR TENDER this court's $100 filing fee. It is *****MORE*****
09/30/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED....It is *****MORE*****
09/30/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the PFR AND PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY ARE HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (BY: ETW)
09/30/2010TMC - (LODGED) PFR - (LODGED) motion for stay - OTSC - ROTSC
10/20/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - to court order
10/20/2010FILING FEE (noa)
10/28/2010 ORDERED that ths PFR IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 15 (a)(2)(2010);... It is FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. (RDTEKG) (rm)
10/28/2010DISMISSED
11/22/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived