judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LYONS (CREAD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34837
Short Caption:LYONS (CREAD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 57244 , 57533
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 92C107161Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/10/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/17/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08776
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of ROA due: 120 days. ROA must include any previously prepared transcripts; ROA shall not include exhibits. 99-09571
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: September 30, 1999. 99-10058
01/10/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. 00-00388
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court affirmed.' fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11534
08/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11612
08/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11612