judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIMS VS. SPRINGBROOK NORTHWEST

Case Information: 38209
Short Caption:SIMS VS. SPRINGBROOK NORTHWESTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45223 , 45472 , 46077
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A426296
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A421463
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/27/2001 / Marks, DanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/10/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Hamilton D. Moore--check no. 8614.
07/20/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12401
07/27/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Daniel Marks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14940
09/18/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15793
09/21/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Daniel Marks.
12/05/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-20429
12/19/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-21386
01/07/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/23/01, 5/30/01. To Court Reporters: Patsy K. Smith and Rene Shabazio. 02-00408
01/28/2002Other Other. Filed Certificate Acknowledging Delivery of Transcript. 02-01833
02/06/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/23/01. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 02-02419
02/11/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: February 28, 2001. To Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 02-02703
03/11/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/28/01. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 02-04319
03/25/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -- Certificate of Service by Mail of reporter's transcript of 2/28/01. 02-05211
04/01/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Associate Out of State Counsel. (Hoffman, Hart & Wagner, and Janet M. Schroer) 02-05781
04/22/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 20, 2002. 02-07148
05/24/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Amended Certificate of Service by Mailing of Appellant's Opening Brief. 02-09203
05/30/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 05/20/02. 02-09452
05/30/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 02-09453
06/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 1, 2002. Ms. Schroer shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondents. However, Nevada attorney Mr. Pearson shall be responsible for all matters presented by respondents in this appeal. See SCR 42(12) (the active member of the State Bar of Nevada who is attorney of record shall be present at all matters in open court); and NRAP 25(e) (all documents submitted to the Supreme Court for filing by a represented party shall include the original signature of at least one attorney of record who is an active member of the State Bar of Nevada). 02-10101
06/28/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 31, 2002 (Stipulated Motion). 02-11141
08/05/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 07/31/02. 02-13345
08/12/2002Order/Procedural Order. On January 28, 2002, Patsy Smith filed a Certificate Acknowledging Delivery of Transcript, however this court never received a copy of the transcript. Ms. Smith shall have 10 days from the date of this order to resubmit the transcript conducted on May 30, 2001. 02-13735
08/19/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. (Rough draft transcript.) Proceedings: May 30, 2001. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 02-14083
09/03/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 08/30/02. 02-15184
01/06/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
03/10/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-03918
03/10/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
04/08/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-05876
04/30/2003Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Hoffman firm - check no. 35110.
04/30/2003Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: April 28, 2003. 03-07341
05/15/2003Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 03-08272
06/10/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-08559
06/10/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/25/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2003. 03-08559