judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION v. JAMES ROBBINS

Case Heading (S-08-0077)
Case Number:S-08-0077Case Docketed On:04/04/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION v. JAMES ROBBINS
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellant (Respondent), v. JAMES ROBBINS, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Michael Thomas Kahler
Douglas J. Moench
AppelleeJames RobbinsMike Cornia

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Jurisdiction - Subject Matter, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 148
Citation:197 P.3d 1243

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/04/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/04/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/22/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
06/27/2008Brief - Appellee and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2008Brief - Appellant reply (certificate of service says served electronically, but comment sent informing must be conventional means).BriefAppellant replyFinal
07/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/23/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/15/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/31/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/31/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/05/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/2/09 .ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal