judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ARTHUR E. KING, INDIVIDUALLY DBA KING FLOOR COMPANY v. J. D. MCGUFF, ET UX.

Case: A-2733
A-2733
05/31/1950
Application for Writ of Error
ARTHUR E. KING, INDIVIDUALLY DBA KING FLOOR COMPANY
J. D. MCGUFF, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/08/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/31/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/01/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/15/1950Opinion issued
06/21/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/21/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/21/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1950Response to Petition
05/31/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/31/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. D. McGuff, et ux.Respondent
Arthur E. King, individually dba King Floor CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information