judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAIG JAMES BEYER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0046)
Case Number:S-08-0046Case Docketed On:02/29/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:CRAIG JAMES BEYER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CRAIG JAMES BEYER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCraig James Beyer Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2008 WY 137
Citation:196 P.3d 777

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/29/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/14/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/25/2008Correspondence - Incoming - Letter from appellant informing Court of new address. Copy sent to Attorney GeneralCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/13/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/06/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, condiential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/19/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/05/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/05/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/09/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/08/08 by Roger Calkins.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal