judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANN BLACKWELL V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES

Case Information: 10-AA-1211
Short Caption:ANN BLACKWELL V. D.C. DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01495-10Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/24/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAnn Blackwell NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - UnemploymentN
Michael A. MilweeNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (RECVD ONLY).
10/15/2010 ORDERED that petitioner is hereby directed to tender the $100 fee or file a fully completed motion and financial information statemetn to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
11/03/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
11/03/2010DISMISSED
11/24/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived