judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT D. TRAINA V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1212
Short Caption:ROBERT D. TRAINA V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PWVK100821-04Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/12/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRobert D. Traina NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW-NUNC PRO TUNC LW
10/12/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IFP...OR TENDER THE $100 FILING FEE. It is ****MORE****
10/12/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for having been UNTIMELY FILED...OR for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (BY: ETW)
10/12/2010TMC - (LODGED) PFR - OTSC
11/08/2010FILING FEE - $100 Petition for Review fee
12/15/2010 ORDERED that the Clerk SHALL FILE the PFR, NPT to September 29, 2010. It is *****MORE*****
12/15/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that this PFR IS DISMISSED as it is both UNTIMELY...and NON-APPEALABLE... (OBNBKG) (rl)
12/15/2010DISMISSED
01/12/2011MANDATE ISSUED