judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. A. KELLY v. SCOTT MCKAY, ET UX.

Case: A-2698
A-2698
05/09/1950
Application for Writ of Error
W. A. KELLY
SCOTT MCKAY, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/14/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/27/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/25/1950Response to Motion filed
10/14/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/04/1950Opinion issued
06/14/1950Motion for Extension of Time filed
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/27/1950Response to Petition
05/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/09/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. A. KellyPetitioner
Scott McKay, et ux.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information