judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PALMER VS. PIONEER INN (NRAP 5)

Case Information: 38213
Short Caption:PALMER VS. PIONEER INN (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Court of Appeals
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/06/2002 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/06/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/23/2001Order/IncomingFiled Order Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. 01-12424
07/23/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Appellant: $100; Respondent: $100. Due Date: 15 days
07/25/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks--check no. 34557.
07/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Payment of Filing Fee. ($100 paid by law firm of McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks.) 01-12635
07/27/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Del Hardy Esq.--check no. 3577.
07/27/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Payment of Filing Fee. ($100 paid by law firm of Hardy & Associates.) 01-12775
08/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. This is a certified question pursuant to NRAP 5 from the Untied States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Two questions were certified. We conclude that briefing would be appropriate in this case. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve and opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-13901
09/13/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Brief of the Nevada Trial Lawyers Association as Amicus Curiae in Support of Position of Appellant. 01-15528
09/14/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 09/14/01. 01-15554
09/14/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-15555
09/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. requesting permission to file an amicus curiae brief in support of appellant's position. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus curiae brief received on August 13, 2001. 01-15622
09/17/2001BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Trial Lawyers. 01-15530
10/04/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 14, 2001. 01-16754
11/14/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand-delivered by Reno/Carson Messenger. 01-19018
11/14/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-19022
12/31/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
06/28/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Inviting Participation of Amicus Curiae. This case involves questions certified to this court under NRAP 5 by the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The questions concern the interpretation of Nevada Supreme Court Rule 182, a rule of professional conduct. This court invites the State Bar of Nevada to participate in this matter as amicus curiae for the purpose of filing a brief containing points and authorities addressing its position concerning the interpretation of SCR 182 under the circumstances described in the Ninth Circuit's certification order. Should the state bar wish to participate as amicus curiae, we request that its brief be served and filed within 30 days of the date of this order. We direct the clerk of this court to include copies of the Ninth Circuit's certification order and the parties' briefs with the copy of this order served upon bar counsel. 02-11148
06/28/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Rob W. Bare. Pursuant to the Order filed June 28, 2002, we are including copies of the Ninth Circuit's certification order filed July 23, 2001, Opening Brief and Appendix filed September 14, 2001, Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Trial Lawyers Association filed September 13, 2001, Answering Brief and Appendix filed November 14, 2001.
07/18/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on September 6, 2002, at 2:00 p.m. (En Banc)
07/24/2002BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. 02-12656
07/24/2002BriefFiled Amicus Brief. 02-12679
08/27/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/06/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Court En Banc. EN BANC
12/27/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. 'Questions answered as recast.' Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 95. EN BANC 02-22091
01/21/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-00574
01/21/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/06/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 24, 2003. 03-00574