judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARSON CITY VS. BERGE

Case Information: 38212
Short Caption:CARSON CITY VS. BERGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000730AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/01/2001 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Returned check no. 34366 in the amount of $200 to the law firm of McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks.
07/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks LLP
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12420
07/31/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12948
08/01/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/20/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-14097
08/31/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-14758
08/31/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.