judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PHILLIP WOLF v. LARRY ALLEN

Case Heading (S-08-0080)
Case Number:S-08-0080Case Docketed On:04/10/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:PHILLIP WOLF v. LARRY ALLEN
Full Title:PHILLIP WOLF, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LARRY ALLEN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPhillip Wolf Pro Se
AppelleeLarry AllenRichard Mathey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 136
Citation:196 P.3d 775

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/10/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/10/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/07/2008Notice-Internal - Other - See case note when posting filingsNotice-InternalOtherFinal
05/20/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/27/2008Brief - Appellee and copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2008Brief - Appellant reply "motion" to appellees brief. Appellant failed to provide copies for the Court and to serve on counsel for appelleeBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/15/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/25/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/18/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/04/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/04/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/08/08 by Marilyn JensenServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal