judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAIME REYES V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1244
Short Caption:JAIME REYES V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB074-10Filed Date:10/08/2010

Opening Event Date:10/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/05/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/03/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/03/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJaime Reyes N
Neil J. Fagan YN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Michael A. MilweeYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/08/2010FILING FEE of $100 paid
10/12/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq. (OAG)
11/05/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
11/05/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/08/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC) elp
12/14/2010PETITIONER'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
12/14/2010APPENDIX
01/12/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 2/18/11
01/14/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before February 18, 2011. (JAC)
02/14/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 3/4/11. no oppo
02/18/2011 On consideration of respondent's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and the brief of respondent shall be filed on or before March 4, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/03/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
03/03/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/17/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/13/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Reid,Belson
07/12/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Belson and Reid,* Senior Judges)
08/03/2012FiledMandate