judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUCUS VS. AMERICA ONLINE

Case Information: 31106
Short Caption:LUCUS VS. AMERICA ONLINECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A373820Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/01/1997 / White, EarleSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/13/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Gillock firm-check no. 1570.
09/29/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/01/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: Earle W. White, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court)
10/13/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
09/30/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. To date, no final settlement report has been filed. The clerk's office contacted counsel to this appeal and was informed that this matter did not settle. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
10/09/1998Other Other. Filed Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings.
01/29/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Express 1/28/99.) STRICKEN BY ORDER 3/18/99.
01/29/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. (Mailed on: 1/28/99). STRICKEN BY ORDER 3/18/99.
02/16/1999MotionFiled Motion. For Extension of Time within which to File Respondent's Answering Brief.
02/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Court reporter Sharleen Nicholson shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file and serve the requested transcripts or inform this court why she cannot comply with NRAP 9(b). Failure to respond to this order in some manner may result in the imposition of sanctions.
03/03/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Filed Order we grant respondent's motion for an extension of time, to and including April 30, 1999, to file and serve the answering brief.
03/03/1999Other Other. Filed letter from Court Reporter Sharleen Nicholson regarding 02/19/99 order.
03/18/1999Other Other. Filed Substitution of Counsel. Plaintiffs hereby substitute Michael A. Koning of the law firm of Michael A. Koning as counsel of record in place and stead of the law firm of Gillock, Koning, Markley & Killbrew.
03/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On March 3, 1999, court reporter Nicholson filed a response to our order of February 19, 1999. Our review of appellants' appendix indicates that a copy of the requested transcript has been forwarded to this court. Court reporter Nicholson need not file or transcribe any further documents in this case. The clerk shall strike the opening brief and appendix filed herein. Appellants shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve an opening brief and appendix which fully comply with the rules of appellate procedure. Failure to comply with our rules in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions. 2[We vacate order of March 3, 1999. Respondent shall have 60 days from the filing of the opening brief and appendix to file and serve the answering brief.]
03/18/1999Other Other. Stricken by Order: Appellant's Opening Brief and Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2 filed 1/29/99.
04/05/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 4/2/99.)
04/05/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 and 2.
06/03/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 6/1/99.)
08/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
08/25/1999Other Other. Case submitted on briefs.
12/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The clerk of the district court shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, certify and transmit to the clerk of this court any and all documents from the following two actions which were admitted or considered in the proceedings below: (1) In re: AOL Litigation, Case No. BC163992, Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County; and (2) Schwab v. AOL, Case No. 96CH13732, Cook County Circuit Court, Illinois.
01/14/2000Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From district court clerk regarding 12/28/99 order.
03/13/2000Other Other. Resubmitted to the Sourthern Nevada Panel this day. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
03/13/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 28, 1999, we entered an order directing the clerk of the district court to certify and transmit to the clerk of this court any and all documents from the above-referenced actions which may have been admitted or considered in the proceedings below. By way of a letter dated January 11, 2000, the clerk of the district court informed this court that the trial court record does not contain any documents from these actions. Counsel for the parties to this appeal shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, inform this court in writing whether they presented to the court below any documents from the above-referenced actions, whether in the form of exhibits, or attachments to any pleadings or motions. In the event counsel provided any of these documents to the court below, their response to this order shall be accompanied by copies of such documents. 00-06255
05/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address and Firm Name. Smith Williams & Koning, and Michael A. Koning. 00-07728
05/11/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. America Online, Inc's Response to the Court's April 19, 2000 Order. 00-07828
05/11/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Michael A. Koning. In response to the order filed April 19, 2000, the parties did not present to the district court any documents from the other AOL actions. 00-07857
06/08/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Thomas R. C. Wilson.
09/22/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
09/28/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We hereby AFFIRM the order of the district court".-SNP99B-CY/WM/MS 00-17182
10/24/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17192
10/24/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2000. 00-17192