judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARRY CHAMBERLAIN and NOREEN CHAMBERLAIN, Husband and Wife v. ROSE VELASQUEZ, MIKE VELASQUEZ, MARY VELASQUEZ and ERNESTINO VELASQUEZ

Case Heading (S-08-0044)
Case Number:S-08-0044Case Docketed On:02/25/2008
Linked To: S-08-0043
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:LARRY CHAMBERLAIN and NOREEN CHAMBERLAIN, Husband and Wife v. ROSE VELASQUEZ, MIKE VELASQUEZ, MARY VELASQUEZ and ERNESTINO VELASQUEZ
Full Title:LARRY CHAMBERLAIN and NOREEN CHAMBERLAIN, Husband and Wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ROSE VELASQUEZ, MIKE VELASQUEZ, MARY VELASQUEZ and ERNESTINO VELASQUEZ, Land Owners, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLarry ChamberlainHeather A. Jacobson
AppellantNoreen ChamberlainHeather A. Jacobson
AppelleeRose VelasquezPatrick Dixon
AppelleeMike VelasquezPatrick Dixon
AppelleeMary VelasquezPatrick Dixon
AppelleeErnestino VelasquezPatrick Dixon

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property -Servitudes, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2009 WY 80
Citation:209 P.3d 888

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/25/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/25/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/19/2008Brief - Appellant and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
04/30/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/15/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from the District Court Clerk, five volumes; Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volumes IV & V, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Heather Jacobson for appellees in S-08-0043.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick Dixon for appellants and Heather A. Jacobson for appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/18/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, (S-08-0043) and reversing part (S-08-0044), Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/07/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 7/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal