judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCUS J. LEMON V. STEPHEN W. BOWDEN

Case Information: 10-CV-1207
Short Caption:MARCUS J. LEMON V. STEPHEN W. BOWDENClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5304-10Filed Date:09/24/2010

Opening Event Date:09/24/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/18/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarcus J. Lemon NPro SeN
AppelleeStephen W. Bowden NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/12/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
10/12/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
10/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (37-pgs/tape 8/27/10 proc.)w/cd
10/21/2010RECORD INDEX
10/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/25/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 10/12/10 (no signature on cert of service)
10/28/2010 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS PREMATURELY FILED since all matters filed in Superior Court have not yet been resolved. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (RDTEKG) (rm)
10/28/2010DISMISSED
11/18/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived