judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NATIONWIDE INS. CO. VS. SCHULTZ

Case Information: 33122
Short Caption:NATIONWIDE INS. CO. VS. SCHULTZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A339063Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/09/1998 / Christensen, CarlSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/09/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/07/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. Received Filing Fee of $200. (Schreck -Morris -- check no. 7449).
10/07/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
10/09/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Issued Notice of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge; Carl J. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/16/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document (judgment filed 10/15/97) to Clark County Clerk. Due date: 10 days.
10/16/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/23/1998Other Other. Filed Certified Copy of Order filed in district court on October 15, 1997.
10/27/1998Other Other. Mailed additional notice of appeal documents to Settlement Judge Christensen.
11/06/1998Other Other. Filed Substitution of Attorneys: Nationwide Insurance Company hereby substitutes the firm of Schreck Morris as its attorneys of record in the place and stead of the law firm of Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen, Nelson & Sanders.
11/12/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Filed Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants shall have 15 day from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
12/21/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Filed Rule 9(a) Certification. (No Transcript Requested).
01/22/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Filed Stipulation regarding Joint Appendix.
02/05/1999BriefFiled Brief. Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msngr. 2/5/99).
02/05/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Filed Joint Appendix. (Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msngr. 2/5/99).
02/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On January 22, 1999, the parties filed a "stipulation regarding joint appendix." NRAP 30 requires the parties to confer and attempt to reach agreement regarding a joint appendix, the parties are not required to file a stipulation confirming their agreement. Nonetheless, we approve the stipulation to the extent that it complies with NRAP 30. Filing an appendix which does not comply with NRAP 30 may subject counsel to sanctions.
02/23/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Filed Joint Appendix (Amended). (Reno/Carson Messenger.)
02/25/1999BriefFiled Brief. Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 2/23/99).
03/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief on Appeal. (Reno/Carson Messenger-hand delivered.)
03/26/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Filed Appellant's Reply Appendix. (Reno/Carson Messenger).
07/09/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order on the record and briefs filed herein.
07/09/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs this day.
07/09/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger in place and stead of Schreck Morris as counsel for appellant.
08/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush and Eisinger.
10/27/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Filed Notice of Change of Address (Thorndal firm).
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. Nationwide was entitled to an offset under the terms of the Policy. " . . . we reverse the district court order and remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings consisting with this order." fn2[We have also considered Schultz's argument that Nationwide waived a right to claim the offset before this court and conclude that it is without merit.] SNP00A-1-RR/CY/NB 00-21558
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21798
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21798