judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSE VELASQUEZ, MIKE VELASQUEZ, MARY VELASQUEZ and ERNESTINO VELASQUEZ, Land Owners v. LARRY CHAMBERLAIN and NOREEN CHAMBERLAIN, Husband and Wife

Case Heading (S-08-0043)
Case Number:S-08-0043Case Docketed On:02/25/2008
Linked To: S-08-0044
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ROSE VELASQUEZ, MIKE VELASQUEZ, MARY VELASQUEZ and ERNESTINO VELASQUEZ, Land Owners v. LARRY CHAMBERLAIN and NOREEN CHAMBERLAIN, Husband and Wife
Full Title:ROSE VELASQUEZ, MIKE VELASQUEZ, MARY VELASQUEZ and ERNESTINO VELASQUEZ, Land Owners, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. LARRY CHAMBERLAIN and NOREEN CHAMBERLAIN, Husband and Wife, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRose VelasquezPatrick Dixon
AppellantMike VelasquezPatrick Dixon
AppellantMary VelasquezPatrick Dixon
AppellantErnestino VelasquezPatrick Dixon
AppelleeLarry ChamberlainHeather A. Jacobson
AppelleeNoreen ChamberlainHeather A. Jacobson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property -Servitudes, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2009 WY 80
Citation:209 P.3d 888

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/25/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/25/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/25/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/18/2008Fees - Sanctions received - NOA and discharge of sanctionFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
04/14/2008Brief - Appellants and copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
05/23/2008Brief - Appellees; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from the District Court Clerk, five volumes; Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volumes IV & V, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Heather Jacobson for appellees in S-08-0043.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Dixon for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/14/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick Dixon for appellants and Heather A. Jacobson for appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/14/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/18/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, (S-08-0043) and reversing part (S-08-0044), Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/07/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/07/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 7/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal