Case Information: 33275 | |||
Short Caption: | BOLDEN VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C148253 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 01/20/2000 at 1:30 PM | Oral Argument Location: | Las Vegas Office |
Submission Date: | 01/20/2000 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/05/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | ||
11/05/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (fast track notice mailed to all counsel). | ||
11/18/1998 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. June 18, 1998 and June 19, 1998. Court Reporter: Roger Calabrese. | ||
11/25/1998 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Telephonic Extension. The fast track statement shall be served and filed on or before December 3, 1998. | ||
12/11/1998 | Motion | Filed Motion. Application for Extension of Time. | ||
12/11/1998 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. | ||
12/11/1998 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. | ||
12/14/1998 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Clerk's Order the motion file December 11, 1998, is granted. The fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on December 11, 1998, shall be filed, forthwith. | ||
12/14/1998 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | ||
12/14/1998 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. | ||
12/30/1998 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | ||
03/12/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Case Processing Order. Filed Order we have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. The appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 40 days after the date of this order. 2 [We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal.] The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. | ||
04/23/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark). | ||
05/24/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Respondent's Answering brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark). | ||
06/28/1999 | Brief | Filed Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark). | ||
08/09/1999 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Proper person Request for a complete copy of my Trial Transcripts. (Received original and 1 copy-no copy returned). | ||
11/22/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 20, 2000 at the hour of 1:30 p.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (NNP-CY, DA, ML) | ||
01/06/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
01/20/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | ||
02/15/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. Remand with instructions. " . . . we reverse the judgment of conviction in this case and remand the same to the district court for a new trial consistent with the views expressed herein." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-02394 | |
03/14/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-03990 | |
03/14/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/27/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 22, 2000. | 00-03990 |