judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GLORIA I. MENDOZA and JOSEPHINE E. CANO v. LAWRENCE O. GONZALES, AS TRUSTEE OF THE GONZALES FAMILY TRUST, and LAWRENCE O. GONZALES, individually

Case Heading (S-08-0059)
Case Number:S-08-0059Case Docketed On:03/12/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:GLORIA I. MENDOZA and JOSEPHINE E. CANO v. LAWRENCE O. GONZALES, AS TRUSTEE OF THE GONZALES FAMILY TRUST, and LAWRENCE O. GONZALES, individually
Full Title:GLORIA I. MENDOZA and JOSEPHINE E. CANO, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. LAWRENCE O. GONZALES, AS TRUSTEE OF THE GONZALES FAMILY TRUST, and LAWRENCE O. GONZALES, individually, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGloria I. MendozaWilliam L. Hiser
Kelly Marie Neville
AppellantJosephine E. CanoWilliam L. Hiser
Kelly Marie Neville
AppelleeLawrence O. Gonzales, as Trustee of the Gonzales Family TrustThomas A. Thompson
Brandon Wayne Snyder
AppelleeLawrence O. GonzalesThomas A. Thompson
Brandon Wayne Snyder

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property
Opinion Number:2009 WY 50
Citation:204 P.3d 995

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/12/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/12/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/29/2008Brief - Appellants and received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
06/11/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk. (Also received original designation of record with our caption, this was sent back with note to file in district court.)BriefAppelleeFinal
06/25/2008Brief - Appellant reply and received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
06/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/03/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four total volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits (Note: there is no Volume III)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kelly Neville Heck and/or William Hiser for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/16/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Thompson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kelly Marie Neville Heck for appellants and Thomas A. Thompson for appellees) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/27/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/27/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/29/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal