judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NHV INCORPORATED V. DC ALCOHOLIC BEV. CONTOL BD.

Case Information: 10-AA-1225
Short Caption:NHV INCORPORATED V. DC ALCOHOLIC BEV. CONTOL BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PRO-00012-10Filed Date:10/06/2010

Opening Event Date:10/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/12/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerNhv IncorporatedN
Robert P. WaldeckNY
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/06/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/06/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/07/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
11/12/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
11/12/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
12/16/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix no oppo
12/21/2010 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before January 19, 2011. (JAC)
01/07/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix no oppo to 60 days
01/12/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. (JAC)
03/15/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/31/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/31/2011DISMISSED
05/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED