judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2718
A-2718
05/19/1950
Application for Writ of Error
GLEN FALLS INSURANCE COMPANY
FRED MCCOWN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/03/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/03/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/03/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/29/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/29/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/26/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/03/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/03/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/03/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
01/10/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
01/10/1951Opinion issued
09/29/1950Brief on the Merits
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/14/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/29/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/26/1950Response to Petition
05/19/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/19/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fred McCownRespondent
Chas MaysAmicus Curiae
Hobert PriceAmicus Curiae
W. H. Slay, Jr.Amicus Curiae
GLEN FALLS INSURANCE COMPANYPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information