judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STUART BATTLE V. HONORABLE BRIAN HOLEMAN

Case Information: 10-OA-0027
Short Caption:STUART BATTLE V. HONORABLE BRIAN HOLEMANClassification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC526-08Filed Date:10/05/2010

Opening Event Date:10/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerW. Stuart Battle N
L. Barrett Boss NN
Bernard S. GrimmNY
RespondentUnited StatesN
John P. Gidez NN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
RespondentBrian Holeman NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/05/2010PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS Held in Abeyance
10/05/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/06/2010TMC - petition for writ of mandamus - RESPONSES (HOLEMAN, US, DC)
10/26/2010 ORDERED that BOTH THE HON HOLEMAN AND THE UNITED STATES SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, FILE A RESPONSE TO THE PWM...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the DISTRICT IS INVITED TO FILE A RESPONSE W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order....SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending further order of this court. (RZGLNB) (rm)
11/15/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to petitioner's petition for writ of mandamus (filed by Honorable Holeman)
11/15/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to petition for writ of mandamus (filed by USAO)
11/15/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to petition for writ of mandamus (D.C.)
11/23/2010RECEIVED- disburstment order from superior court signed by: J. Brian F. Holeman
12/01/2010FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/01/2010 On further consideration of the PWM...the responses thereto and it appearing that Judge Holeman has issued an order in the campanion appeal, no. 10SP1304, it is ORDERED that the PWM IS DENIED AS MOOT. (RZGLNB) (rm)