judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUTCHINSON VS. STATE

Case Information: 33095
Short Caption:HUTCHINSON VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR970787Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/13/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/30/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel.)
10/13/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We direct the clerk of this court administratively to close the appeal in Docket Number 32973. The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 33095 all documents received or filed in Docket No. 32973, and the appeal shall proceed under Docket No. 33095. Nos. 32973, 33095.
10/13/1998Other Other. TRANSFERRED ALL DOCUMENTS FROM DOCKET NO. 32973 TO DOCKET NO. 33095: 09/09/98 Filing fee waived: Criminal. 09/09/98 Filed Emergency Request for Stay of Sentencing Hearing. 09/10/98 Filed Notice of Appeal (via fax). 09/10/98 Filed Opposition to Emergency Request for Stay of Sentencing Hearing (via fax). 09/10/98 Filed Order on September 9, 1998, appellant filed an emergency motion to stay the sentencing hearing scheduled in this matter for September 10, 1998, at 2:00 p.m. We deny appellant's emergency motion to stay the sentencing hearing. 09/14/98 Filed Opposition to Emergency Request for Stay of Sentencing Hearing. (Original filed via fax on 9/10/98.) 09/15/98 Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Fast track notice mailed to all counsel.)
10/13/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Filed certified copy of Transcript of Proceedings. Jury Trial--June 22, 23, 24, 25, 26, and 29, 1998; Sentencing-- September 8 & 10, 1998. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson.
10/23/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Exemption from Rough Draft Transcript Request.
10/23/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
11/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On October 23, 1998, counsel for appellant filed a motion for exemption from the requirement to file a rough draft transcript request form. The motion is granted.
11/13/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
11/13/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Transmit Original Exhibit.
11/23/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Transmit Original Documents.
11/23/1998MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Bail Pending Appeal.
12/01/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The clerk of the district court shall, within 20 days, transmit Exhibit 9 to this court for consideration by this court.
12/02/1998MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Bail Pending Appeal.
12/04/1998ExhibitReceived Exhibits (copies). Exhibit 9: Compilation of Transcripts admitted June 22, 1998 (contained in a blue binder).
01/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix within 40 days after the date of this order. fn2[We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal.] The answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward a certified copy of the presentence report, in a sealed envelope, for filing and consideration with the appendix.
02/04/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Supplemental Record on Appeal, Certified copy of Pre-Sentence Report--SEALED. Mailed on: 2/3/99.
02/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Order of Remand. Appellant has filed a motion for bail pending appeal which repondent has opposed. This matter must be remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of entry of an order setting forth the court's legal reasons for denying bail and the factors in support therof.
03/03/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Stipulation and Order that Appellant shall have to and including April 7, 1999, to file the Opening Brief.
04/07/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 4/6/99.)
04/07/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
04/27/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 4/26/99.)
06/01/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 5/28/99.)
08/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to advise this court as to whether he has abandoned his motion for bail pending appeal and also advise this court as to whether the district court entered the written order as directed in this court's February 18, 1999, order of remand. If the district court entered such an order appellant shall include in his response a certified copy of the written order.
09/13/1999MotionFiled Motion. Renewed Motion for Bail Pending Appeal.
09/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Bail Pending Appeal.
10/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Order Denying Bail. Appellant has filed in this court a renewed motion for bail pending appeal. The motion is opposed. We conclude that appellant has failed to demonstrate that the district court abused its discretion in denying bail pending appeal. The motion is denied.
12/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein.
12/13/1999Other Other. Case submitted on the briefs this day to the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
12/13/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-01258
02/14/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 00-02313
02/14/2000Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 1702 in the amount of $100.00 returned to Dean R. Heidrich - Criminal matter rehearing fee waived.
05/25/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08765
06/06/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on 6/5/00. 00-09532
06/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09863
06/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 16, 2000. 00-09863
10/23/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. " . . . we deny the petition." EnBanc-RR/CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB. 00-18686
10/23/2000RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Exhibits: Exhibit 9, Compilation of Transcripts admitted June 22, 1998 this day. 00-09863